Steer, Peter Anthony (CPSO#: 61539)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2009