Steeves, Mark Alexander (CPSO#: 82753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Montfort Orthopaedic Group
Suite 202
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Steeves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steeves ( CPSO# 82753 )

Business Address:
The Montfort Orthopaedic Group
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER STEEVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012