Steeves, Thomas Doran Lewis (CPSO#: 84515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 906
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5505
Fax: (416) 864-5635
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Steeves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Steeves ( CPSO# 84515 )

Business Address:
Suite 906
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS DORAN LEWIS STEEVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2009