Stefaniu, Rodica (CPSO#: 58566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Av
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z4
Phone: 416 242 1000 Ext. 43059
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

640 Ross avenue east
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

640 Ross avenue east
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

1560 Yonge Street
Suite 240
Toronto ON  M4T 2S9
Canada
Phone: (416) 961-6481
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODICA STEFANIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991