Steffens, Gregory Michael (CPSO#: 60645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L4
Phone: (705) 728-6952
Fax: (705) 728-5393
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Steffens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Steffens ( CPSO# 60645 )

Business Address:
306 - 121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L1
Phone Number: (705) 728-6952

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MICHAEL STEFFENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFFENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1991