Stefopulos, Thomas (CPSO#: 55672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Macedonian

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 328-6143
Fax: (705) 328-6164
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefopulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stefopulos ( CPSO# 55672 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6143

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Thomas Stefopulos 29 Toronto Street Uxbrige, Ontario L9P 1V9
Date Received: 22 May 2008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 13, 2015
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 2, 2015, Haliburton Highlands Health Services notified the College that Dr. Thomas Stefopulos's privileges were restricted, effective January 13, 2015.

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS STEFOPULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFOPULOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)