Stefurak, Taresa Luba (CPSO#: 68178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General
Suite C304
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6406
Fax: (416) 469-6584
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

400- 1 Valleybrook Dr
North York ON  M3B2S7
Canada
Phone: 4163869761
Fax: 4163860458
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARESA LUBA STEFURAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFURAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000