Steiman, Amanda Joie (CPSO#: 84363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Building
Suite 2-003, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4707
Fax: (416) 586-8489
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Steiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steiman ( CPSO# 84363 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph And Wolfe Lebovic Building
Suite 2 - 223, Box 10
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA JOIE STEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011