Steiman, Asenath (CPSO#: 108389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  09 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab - University Centre
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-105
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3442 Ext. 3027
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
14 St Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Rehab - Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Asenath Steiman may practise internal medicine and geriatric medicine
                  at Mount Sinai Hospital, Bridgepoint Active Healthcare and the University
                  Health  Network  in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on January 9, 2018.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Steiman's knowledge, skill, judgment or  attitude, does not provide
                        the  required reports to the College by the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Steiman's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the  College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Steiman's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  January 11, 2016, and will expire on or
                  before January 9, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.