Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stein, Bernard Albert (CPSO#: 21297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-5991
Fax: (416) 756-6671
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD ALBERT STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1968