Stein, Jeffrey Charles (CPSO#: 65746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Division of Cardiology Room 3670
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-6851
Fax: (306) 655-6854

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHARLES STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1994