Stein, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 78993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 604-0053
Fax: (416) 604-0003
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Stein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stein ( CPSO# 78993 )

Business Address:
Suite 215
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 604-0053

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 25 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2007 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007