Steinberg, Carolyn Rita (CPSO#: 45462)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: Gruenwald, Carolyn Rita (used until: 14 Jun 1977 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2000