Steinberg, Hedy (CPSO#: 59632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Rosenberg + Hedy Steinberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Steinberg ( CPSO# 59632 )
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 64904 )

Business Address:
210 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-9044

Business Address:
406 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 256-9200

Business Address:
140 - 135 Queen's Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 231-5229

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEDY STEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989