Steinberg, Joyce Leta (CPSO#: 57533)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Finch University of Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1 Astellas Way Northbrook, IL 60062 USA
Date Received: 15 May 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014