Steinhart, Allan Hillary (CPSO#: 53987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
600 University Avenue
Room 445
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5121
Fax: (416) 586-3174
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steinhart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steinhart ( CPSO# 53987 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 445
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN HILLARY STEINHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINHART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1985