Steirman, Michael (CPSO#: 54145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Ext. 1525
Fax: (905) 472-7078
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Steirman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steirman ( CPSO# 54145 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
110 Cooper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 471-6996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEIRMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIRMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1985