Stelzer-Chilton, Ashleigh Dawn (CPSO#: 79343)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2008