Stemeroff, Neil Ralph (CPSO#: 32782)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stemeroff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 5, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Stemeroff has resigned from the College in the face of an investigation into his conduct under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.