Stemmer-Rachamimov, Anat Olga (CPSO#: 65684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Italian

Education:Universita di Milano, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Masschusetts General Hospital
Pathology Department
Warren Building Room 333
55 Fruit Street
Boston MA  02114
United States
Phone: (617) 726-5516
Fax: (617) 724-1813
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13 th street
Building 149
ASR Laboratory, Molecular Pathology
Charlestown MA  02016
United States
Phone: (617) 726-5510
County: 
Electoral District: 

13 th street
Building 149
ASR Laboratory, Molecular Pathology
Charlestown MA  02016
United States
Phone: (617) 726-5510
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAT OLGA STEMMER-RACHAMIMOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEMMER-RACHAMIMOV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1993