Stemp, Donald Fredrick (CPSO#: 21410)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald F. Stemp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Oct 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015