Stempien, Matthew Walter (CPSO#: 30675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Walmart Walk-In Clinic
90 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L9H 7K6
Canada
Phone: (905) 690-1418
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew W. Stempien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stempien ( CPSO# 30675 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-3437

Business Address:
90 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L9H 7K6
Phone Number: (905) 690-1418

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 8, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 8, 2016, Joseph Brant Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Matthew Walter Stempien’s privileges were suspended on an immediate and interim basis.

On January 26, 2017, Joseph Brant Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Matthew Stempien resigned his privileges during an investigation into his competence.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 5, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Matthew Walter
            Stempien, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Stempien
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. MATTHEW WALTER STEMPIEN
                                          ("Dr. Stempien")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Stempien, certificate of registration number 30675, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Stempien, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (4)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Stempien, voluntarily undertake that I will not engage in
                        any of the following areas of practice:
                  
                        (i)   Emergency Medicine
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Stempien, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Stempien, undertake that I will agree to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Stempien, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (10)  I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (11)  I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Stempien, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Stempien has voluntarily undertaken not to engage in the
                              practice of emergency medicine. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Stempien, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of
                  my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Matthew Walter Stempien to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 5, 2017:

Dr. Stempien has voluntarily undertaken not to engage in the practice of emergency medicine.

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On February 5, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Milton, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. M.W. Stempien in respect of an incident that took place in February 2007.