Stenerson, Paul Erik (CPSO#: 57991)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014