Stenn, Peter Geiling (CPSO#: 55541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43034
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GEILING STENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STENN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986