Stephen, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 54227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7653
Fax: (905) 472-7605
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher M. Stephen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stephen ( CPSO# 54227 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7093

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
Suite 201
6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 640-2243

Business Address:
Suite 202
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 471-6996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL STEPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1985