Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stephen, David John Garth (CPSO#: 67496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook H S C
M G 365
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6813
Fax: (416) 480-5886
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Stephen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stephen ( CPSO# 67496 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook H S C
M G 365
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6813

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN GARTH STEPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993