Stephen, John Daniel (CPSO#: 28489)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Phone: (416) 398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Instructions: Effective December 12, 2014, medical records for patients of Dr. Stephen will be located at Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
Date Received: 02 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017