Stephen, Lorne James (CPSO#: 22883)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2015

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 1, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lorne Stephen has voluntarily resigned and agreed not to reapply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.