Stephens, Janine Wynn (CPSO#: 78561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 The East Mall
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINE WYNN STEPHENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2002 to 23 Oct 2002
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 14 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003