Stepita, Edith (CPSO#: 23868)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Names: Stepita, Edith (used until: 15 Jun 1988 )     Stepita-Ulicny, Edith (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German, Hungarian, Polish, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004