Stergiopoulos, Victoria (CPSO#: 71231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 34200
Fax: (416) 583-1299
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Stergiopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Stergiopoulos ( CPSO# 71231 )

Business Address:
CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Suite CUHS 343
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA STERGIOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERGIOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2002