Stern, Alex (CPSO#: 64078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 506
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 428-0210
Fax: (905) 428-0449
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alex Stern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stern ( CPSO# 64078 )

Business Address:
Suite 506
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX STERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992