Stern, Hartley Samuel (CPSO#: 27432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hartley Stern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 19 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARTLEY SAMUEL STERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1975