Stern, Jerry (CPSO#: 46302)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Stern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 840 McConnell Ave Cornwall, ON K6H 5S5
Date Received: 22 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2017