Sternberg, Shelley Ann (CPSO#: 61724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Hungarian

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Agrippas St.
Jerusalem 92509
Israel
Phone: 6238238

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY ANN STERNBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERNBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Sep 1989 to 02 Nov 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1995