Steven, David Andrew (CPSO#: 70255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-323
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3297
Fax: (519) 663-3296
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Steven Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Steven ( CPSO# 70255 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
A10-323 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3297

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW STEVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2003