Stevens, Brett Jeremy David (CPSO#: 65437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 634-2504
Fax: (905) 634-6551
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brett Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Stevens ( CPSO# 65437 )

Business Address:
200 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 634-2504

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 15 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRETT JEREMY DAVID STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993