Stevens, Donald George Hart (CPSO#: 19178)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 87 Peevers Crescent Newmarket ON L3Y 7T2
Date Received: 08 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2016