Stevens, Liisa H (CPSO#: 83976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth & Smiths Falls Distr Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls, Ontario
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hôpital de Gatineau
909, boulevard Vérendrye
Gatineau (Québec) J8P 7H2
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Canada
Phone: (819) 966-6100
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Caza ( CPSO# 72485 )
Dr. L. Stevens ( CPSO# 83976 )

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 282-2330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIISA H STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 29 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009