Stevens, Robert Louis (CPSO#: 59951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional
Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert L. Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2013

Dr. R. Stevens ( CPSO# 59951 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional
Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4380

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 15 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROBERT LOUIS STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1990