Stevens, Samuel Darwin (CPSO#: 57250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
68 William Street
Brockville ON  K6V 4V5
Phone: (613) 342-1254
Fax: (613) 342-7728
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL DARWIN STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1988