Stevenson, Colin George (CPSO#: 77524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
100 main street west
3rd floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 546-9885
Fax: (905) 972-8903
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN GEORGE STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2005