Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stevenson, Peter (CPSO#: 70643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
675 Queen Street South, Suite 115
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0662
Fax: (519) 603-0518
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Stevenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stevenson ( CPSO# 70643 )

Business Address:
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0662

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4380

Business Address:
Freeport Site
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 894-8346

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1996