Stevenson, Robert Francis (CPSO#: 26338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Alworth Place
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5W5
Phone: (705) 946-5068
Fax: (705) 946-2854
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

R & S Vision Centre
Unit 4
100 Waterloo Road
Timmins ON  P4N 4X5
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-7327
Fax: (705) 267-7328
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

955 Queen St. East, Suite 140
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 942-2020
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANCIS STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1974