Stevenson, Sandra Jean (CPSO#: 72103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2224
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA JEAN STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1998 to 21 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 1998 to 03 Apr 1998
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2000