Stewardson, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 86591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Cooke, Julie Anne (used until: 19 Jun 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Spring St
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: 613-256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stewardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stewardson ( CPSO# 86591 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE STEWARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009