Stewart, Alexander Keith (CPSO#: 56169)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2008