Stewart, Aviva Tamara (CPSO#: 73478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Rappaport, Aviva Tamara (used until: 05 Dec 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke General Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVIVA TAMARA STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1999