Stewart, George Ivan (CPSO#: 30905)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George I. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 195 Bradstone St Kingston, ON K7P 3J3
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017