Stewart, Jacqueline Carol (CPSO#: 51742)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2006